PA HB700 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 23, 2002 (P.L.298, No.39), known as the Main Street Act, further providing for the duration of grants.
Title
Further providing for the duration of grants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-25 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-25 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |