PA HB665 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-23 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-23 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 15, 1961 (P.L.987, No.442), known as the Pennsylvania Prevailing Wage Act, further providing for definitions; further providing for specifications; and providing for protection of workmen.
Title
Further providing for definitions; further providing for specifications; and providing for protection of workmen.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-26 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-05-06 | House | Removed from table |
2014-05-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-03-12 | House | Removed from table |
2014-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2013-12-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-10-21 | House | Removed from table |
2013-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-28 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-11 | House | Removed from table |
2013-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-04-16 | House | First consideration |
2013-04-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |