PA HB659 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-24 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-24 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, further providing for inheritance tax.
Title
Further providing for inheritance tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - House - HB 659 PN 736, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2013-04-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-04-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-1) |
2013-04-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-04-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-04-10 | House | Second consideration |
2013-04-09 | House | Removed from table |
2013-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-03-12 | House | First consideration |
2013-03-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to FINANCE |