PA HB544 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-6)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-22 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-22 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 2, 1965 (P.L.1860, No.586), entitled "An act encouraging landowners to make land and water areas available to the public for recreational purposes by limiting liability in connection therewith, and repealing certain acts," further providing for liability for landowners to recreational users; and providing for attorney fees and court costs.
Title
Amending the act of February 2, 1965 (P.L.1860, No.586), entitled "An act encouraging landowners to make land and water areas available to the public for recreational purposes by limiting liability in connection therewith, and repealing certain acts," further providing for liability for landowners to recreational users; and providing for attorney fees and court costs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-25 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2014-05-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-03-11 | House | Removed from table |
2014-02-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-12-12 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-17 | House | Removed from table |
2013-04-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-04-22 | House | First consideration |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |