PA HB309 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-24 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-24 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, providing for a natural gas vehicle tax credit.
Title
Providing for a natural gas vehicle tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - HB 309 PN 1519, FP (Y: 107 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 309 PN 1432, MOT APPEAL CHAIR, DERMODY (Y: 109 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 309 PN 1432, 2013 A880, GROVE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 309 PN 1432, MOT APPEAL CHAIR, DERMODY (Y: 109 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 309 PN 1432, 2013 A880, GROVE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2013-04-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (107-77) |
2013-04-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-04-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-04-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-04-10 | House | Removed from table |
2013-04-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-04-09 | House | First consideration |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to FINANCE |