PA HB301 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-24 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-24 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, providing for a natural gas fleet vehicle tax credit; and imposing penalties.
Title
Providing for a natural gas fleet vehicle tax credit; and imposing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - HB 301 PN 1517, FP (Y: 110 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 301 PN 1430, MOT APPEAL CHAIR, DERMODY (Y: 109 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 301 PN 1430, MOT APPEAL CHAIR, VITALI (Y: 109 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 301 PN 1430, 2013 A722, STURLA (Y: 192 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 301 PN 1430, 2013 A745, WHITE (Y: 88 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 301 PN 1430, 2013 A740, WHITE (Y: 89 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 301 PN 1430, 2013 A736, STURLA (Y: 89 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 301 PN 1430, 2013 A727, STURLA (Y: 89 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 301 PN 1430, 2013 A867, SAYLOR (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 301 PN 1430, MOT APPEAL CHAIR, DERMODY (Y: 109 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 301 PN 1430, MOT APPEAL CHAIR, VITALI (Y: 109 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 301 PN 1430, 2013 A722, STURLA (Y: 192 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 301 PN 1430, 2013 A745, WHITE (Y: 88 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 301 PN 1430, 2013 A740, WHITE (Y: 89 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 301 PN 1430, 2013 A736, STURLA (Y: 89 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 301 PN 1430, 2013 A727, STURLA (Y: 89 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 301 PN 1430, 2013 A867, SAYLOR (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2013-04-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (110-77) |
2013-04-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-04-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-04-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-04-10 | House | Removed from table |
2013-04-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-04-09 | House | First consideration |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to FINANCE |