PA HB290 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on November 27 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-11-27 - Act No. 92
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 19, 1988 (P.L.1262, No.156), known as the Local Option Small Games of Chance Act, further providing for definitions and for games of chance permitted; providing for prohibition regarding pools; further providing for prize limits and for limited sales; providing for raffle sales; further providing for distributor licenses, for registration of manufacturers, for regulations of department, for licensing of eligible organizations to conduct games of chance, for special permits and for revocation of licenses; providing for affiliated clubs; further providing for enforcement; and providing for pool selling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions and for games of chance permitted; providing for prohibition regarding pools; further providing for prize limits and for limited sales; providing for raffle sales; further providing for distributor licenses, for registration of manufacturers, for regulations of department, for licensing of eligible organizations to conduct games of chance, for special permits and for revocation of licenses; providing for affiliated clubs; further providing for enforcement; and providing for pool selling.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-11-19 - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - HB 290 PN 2651, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - HB 290 PN 2651, CONCUR (Y: 190 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - HB 290 PN 2651, 2013 A4524, SUSP RULES, KRIEGER (Y: 127 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-10-23 - HB 290 PN 2581, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-22 - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - HB 290 PN 772, FP (Y: 186 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - HB 290 PN 772, 2013 A192, KULA (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - HB 290 PN 576, 2013 A134, KAUFFMAN (Y: 181 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - HB 290 PN 576, 2013 A168, NEILSON (Y: 183 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - HB 290 PN 576, 2013 A166, KULA (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - HB 290 PN 576, 2013 A165, BROOKS (Y: 186 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-27SenateAct No. 92
2013-11-27SenateApproved by the Governor
2013-11-21SenatePresented to the Governor
2013-11-20SenateSigned in Senate
2013-11-19SenateSigned in House
2013-11-19SenateSenate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments (47-3)
2013-11-19SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2013-11-19SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2013-11-18SenateIn the Senate
2013-11-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (190-11)
2013-11-13HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as amended
2013-11-12HouseRe-committed to RULES
2013-10-23HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2013-10-23HouseReferred to RULES
2013-10-23HouseIn the House
2013-10-23SenateThird consideration and final passage (45-5)
2013-10-22SenateRe-reported as amended
2013-06-20SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2013-06-20SenateSecond consideration
2013-06-19SenateFirst consideration
2013-06-19SenateReported as amended
2013-03-08SenateReferred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
2013-02-13SenateIn the Senate
2013-02-13HouseFinal passage (186-10)
2013-02-13HouseThird consideration, with amendments
2013-02-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2013-02-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2013-02-12HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2013-02-06HouseRemoved from table
2013-02-05HouseLaid on the table
2013-02-05HouseFirst consideration
2013-02-05HouseReported as amended
2013-01-30HouseReferred to GAMING OVERSIGHT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2013&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=290
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=0438
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=0576
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=0772
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=0814
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=0438
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=0576
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=0772
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=0814
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=2099
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=2581
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2013&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=2651
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=61
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=62
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=63
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=64
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=69
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=70
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2013&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=31&theDate=06/19/2013&rNbr=337
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2013&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/22/2013&rNbr=540
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=295
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=879
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=880
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2013&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=323
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2013&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=11/19/2013&rNbr=589

Bill Comments

feedback