PA HB2481 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 204
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 204
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Treasury Department to process Supplemental Security Income State Supplement Payments for other states; providing for duties of the Treasury Department; and establishing the SSP Processing Account.
Title
Authorizing the Treasury Department to process Supplemental Security Income State Supplement Payments for other states; providing for duties of the Treasury Department; and establishing the SSP Processing Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-14 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-08 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-08 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Act No. 204 |
2014-10-31 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-20 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (181-15) |
2014-10-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-15 | House | In the House |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2014-10-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-1) |
2014-10-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-24 | House | Second consideration |
2014-09-23 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-22 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-09-16 | House | Referred to FINANCE |