PA HB2471 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-15)
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-07 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-07 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in casualty insurance, providing for pharmaceutical coverage for oral anticancer medications.
Title
In casualty insurance, providing for pharmaceutical coverage for oral anticancer medications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-07 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2014-10-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-1) |
2014-10-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-24 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-17 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-09-15 | House | Referred to HEALTH |