PA HB2409 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on October 3 2012 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-10 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act providing for actions for costs of care of seized animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for actions for costs of care of seized animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-10-03 - HB 2409 PN 4164, FP (Y: 192 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - HB 2409 PN 4059, 2011 A13526, KELLER, M. K. (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-10SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2012-10-03SenateIn the Senate
2012-10-03HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-5)
2012-10-03HouseRe-reported as committed
2012-10-03HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2012-10-02HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2012-10-01HouseRemoved from table
2012-09-24HouseLaid on the table
2012-09-24HouseFirst consideration
2012-09-24HouseReported as amended
2012-09-21HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2011&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2409
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2409&pn=4026
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2409&pn=4059
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2409&pn=4164
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1878
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1903

Bill Comments

feedback