PA HB2385 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-30 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-30 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in bonds and recognizances, further providing for bail to be governed by general rules.
Title
In bonds and recognizances, further providing for bail to be governed by general rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2014-09-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-09-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (141-46) |
2014-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-16 | House | Second consideration |
2014-09-15 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-27 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-06-24 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |