PA HB2384 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-07 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-07 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sentencing, further providing for collection of restitution, reparation, fees, costs, fines and penalties.
Title
In sentencing, further providing for collection of restitution, reparation, fees, costs, fines and penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-07 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2014-10-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-1) |
2014-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-16 | House | Second consideration |
2014-09-15 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-27 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-06-24 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |