PA HB2355 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Act No. 128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Act No. 128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the capital budget for the fiscal year 2014-2015; itemizing redevelopment assistance capital projects to be constructed or acquired or assisted by the Department of Community and Economic Development, together with their estimated financial costs; authorizing the incurring of debt without the approval of the electors for the purpose of financing the projects to be constructed, acquired or assisted by the Department of Community and Economic Development; and making appropriations.
Title
Providing for the capital budget for the fiscal year 2014-2015; itemizing redevelopment assistance capital projects to be constructed or acquired or assisted by the Department of Community and Economic Development, together with their estimated financial costs; authorizing the incurring of debt without the approval of the electors for the purpose of financing the projects to be constructed, acquired or assisted by the Department of Community and Economic Development; and making appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-29 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-10 | House | Act No. 128 |
2014-07-10 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-07-09 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-07-08 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-07-02 | House | Signed in House |
2014-07-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (172-27) |
2014-07-01 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-07-01 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-07-01 | House | In the House |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-29 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-06-28 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (180-22) |
2014-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-26 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-24 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-24 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-06-18 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |