PA HB2354 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 175
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 175
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to receive approval from the General Assembly for a State plan to regulate carbon dioxide emissions for existing stationary sources prior to submitting the State plan to the United States Environmental Protection Agency for approval.
Title
Requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to receive approval from the General Assembly for a State plan to regulate carbon dioxide emissions for existing stationary sources prior to submitting the State plan to the United States Environmental Protection Agency for approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-08 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-06 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-06 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | Senate | Act No. 175 |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (31-17) |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Motion to revert to Prior Printer's No. 3898 |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2014-07-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-07-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (144-59) |
2014-06-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-29 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-25 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-25 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-06-18 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |