PA HB2338 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Act No. 15A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Act No. 15A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations to the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania.
Title
Making appropriations to the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-27 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-27 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-10 | Senate | Act No. 15A |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-28 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-9) |
2014-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-25 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-06-10 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |