PA HB23 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, extensively revising the Uniform Arbitration Act; and making editorial changes.
Title
Extensively revising the Uniform Arbitration Act; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Grell [R] | Rep. Stephen Bloom [R] | Rep. Bryan Cutler [R] | Rep. Todd Rock [R] |
Rep. Ron Marsico [R] | Rep. Mark Keller [R] | Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. Scott Petri [R] |
Rep. Jaret Gibbons [D] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Ron Miller [R] | Rep. Duane Milne [R] |
Rep. Thomas Murt [R] | Rep. Garth Everett [R] | Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2014-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-07-29 | House | Removed from table |
2014-07-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-16 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-07 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-01-29 | House | Removed from table |
2014-01-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-11-20 | House | Removed from table |
2013-11-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-09-25 | House | Removed from table |
2013-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-18 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-04-23 | House | Removed from table |
2013-04-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-02-13 | House | Removed from table |
2013-02-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-02-12 | House | First consideration |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-01-16 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |