PA HB2299 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in children's health care, further providing for legislative findings and intent, for definitions and for children's health care eligibility and renewal processes.
Title
In children's health care, further providing for legislative findings and intent, for definitions and for children's health care eligibility and renewal processes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-09 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-09 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-06-02 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |