PA HB2288 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Act No. 10A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Act No. 10A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the restricted revenue accounts within the State Gaming Fund and from the State Gaming Fund to the Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, the Department of Revenue, the Pennsylvania State Police and the Attorney General for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2015, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014.
Title
Making appropriations from the restricted revenue accounts within the State Gaming Fund and from the State Gaming Fund to the Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, the Department of Revenue, the Pennsylvania State Police and the Attorney General for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2015, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-10 | Senate | Act No. 10A |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2014-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-06-09 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |