PA HB2287 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Act No. 9A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Act No. 9A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund and from Federal augmentation funds to the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission for the fiscal year July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2015.
Title
Making appropriations from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund and from Federal augmentation funds to the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission for the fiscal year July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-10 | Senate | Act No. 9A |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2014-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-06-02 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |