PA HB2272 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-14)
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-07 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-07 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of State Route 309 North in Lynn Township, Lehigh County, between the intersections of Northwest Road and Long Court and Mosserville Road and Mountain Road, as the Lance Corporal Brandon J. Van Parys Memorial Road.
Title
Designating a portion of State Route 309 North in Lynn Township, Lehigh County, between the intersections of Northwest Road and Long Court and Mosserville Road and Mountain Road, as the Lance Corporal Brandon J. Van Parys Memorial Road.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-07 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2014-10-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2014-09-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-23 | House | Second consideration |
2014-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-17 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-05-28 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |