PA HB2138 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-15 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-15 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in pupils and attendance, further providing for cost of tuition and maintenance of certain exceptional children in approved institutions; in charter schools, further providing for funding for charter schools; and, in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for special education payments to school districts and for extraordinary special education program expenses.
Title
In pupils and attendance, further providing for cost of tuition and maintenance of certain exceptional children in approved institutions; in charter schools, further providing for funding for charter schools; and, in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for special education payments to school districts and for extraordinary special education program expenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-15 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-19 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-28 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-09 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |