PA HB2136 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-02 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-02 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 22, 1974 (P.L.589, No.205), known as the Unfair Insurance Practices Act, further providing for definitions.
Title
Further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2014-04-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-04-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2014-04-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-04-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-04-09 | House | Second consideration |
2014-04-08 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-07 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-07 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-03-31 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |