PA HB2128 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-06 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-06 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the annual designation and holiday observance of the third Saturday in June as "Juneteenth National Freedom Day" in this Commonwealth.
Title
Providing for the annual designation and holiday observance of the third Saturday in June as "Juneteenth National Freedom Day" in this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2014-06-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2014-06-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-02 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-02 | House | Second consideration |
2014-05-07 | House | Removed from table |
2014-05-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-05-06 | House | First consideration |
2014-05-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-03-25 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |