PA HB2120 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in neighborhood blight and reclamation and revitalization, further providing for definitions, for asset attachment, for duty of out-of-State owners of property in this Commonwealth and for duty of association and trust owners.
Title
In neighborhood blight and reclamation and revitalization, further providing for definitions, for asset attachment, for duty of out-of-State owners of property in this Commonwealth and for duty of association and trust owners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-24 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Act No. 171 |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-16 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-15 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-15 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (197-0) |
2014-10-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-14 | House | In the House |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Amended on second consideration |
2014-09-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-06-28 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |
2014-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2014-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-26 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-03-19 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |