PA HB2110 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 201
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 201
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, further providing for definitions, for powers and duties of secretary and for report.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for powers and duties of secretary and for report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-14 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Act No. 201 |
2014-10-31 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-20 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (195-1) |
2014-10-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-15 | House | In the House |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2014-04-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-04-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2014-04-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-04-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-04-28 | House | Second consideration |
2014-04-09 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-08 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-08 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-03-31 | House | Re-referred to FINANCE |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to FINANCE |
2014-03-18 | House | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |