PA HB2098 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in snowmobiles and all-terrain vehicles, further providing for definitions.
Title
In snowmobiles and all-terrain vehicles, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2014-04-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-04-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2014-04-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-04-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-04-08 | House | Second consideration |
2014-04-07 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-02 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |