PA HB2069 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, further defining "eligible entity"; and further providing for unlawful acts relative to liquor, malt and brewed beverages and licensees.
Title
Further defining "eligible entity"; and further providing for unlawful acts relative to liquor, malt and brewed beverages and licensees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (174-22) |
2014-06-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-11 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-03 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-03 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |