PA HB1907 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-12)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 169
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-12)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 169
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring a hospital to provide notice to a patient of the patient's outpatient status, and the impact of the outpatient status on insurance coverage.
Title
Requiring a hospital to provide notice to a patient of the patient's outpatient status, and the impact of the outpatient status on insurance coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-06 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | Senate | Act No. 169 |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |
2014-04-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-04-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2014-04-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-04-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-04-07 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-04-02 | House | Vote on second consideration reconsidered (195-4) |
2014-03-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-03-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-03-18 | House | Second consideration |
2014-03-17 | House | Removed from table |
2014-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-03-12 | House | First consideration |
2014-03-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-12-11 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |