PA HB1794 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-11)
Status: Passed on April 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-18 - Act No. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-11)
Status: Passed on April 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-18 - Act No. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating Route 11 in Montour County as Veterans Highway.
Title
Designating Route 11 in Montour County as Veterans Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-18 | House | Act No. 38 |
2014-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-04-09 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-04-09 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-04-09 | House | Signed in House |
2014-04-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (191-0) |
2014-04-09 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-04-07 | House | In the House |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-04-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2014-01-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-01-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2014-01-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-01-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-01-13 | House | Second consideration |
2013-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2013-11-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-11-13 | House | First consideration |
2013-11-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |