PA HB1769 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, further providing for responsible alcohol management.
Title
Further providing for responsible alcohol management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (144-48) |
2014-06-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-03 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-03 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-10-16 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |