PA HB1750 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-16 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-16 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in riot, disorderly conduct and related offenses, further providing for the offense of cruelty to animals.
Title
In riot, disorderly conduct and related offenses, further providing for the offense of cruelty to animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - House - HB 1750 PN 2650, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - House - HB 1750 PN 2485, 2013 A4267, MAHER (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - House - HB 1750 PN 2650, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - House - HB 1750 PN 2485, 2013 A4267, MAHER (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-16 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-15 | House | In the House |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (36-12) |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-12-04 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-11-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-11-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2013-11-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-11-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-11-13 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-11-12 | House | Removed from table |
2013-10-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-10-23 | House | First consideration |
2013-10-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-10-15 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |