PA HB1733 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-25 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-25 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for suspension of operating privilege; and, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for the offense of homicide by vehicle while driving under influence.
Title
In licensing of drivers, further providing for suspension of operating privilege; and, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for the offense of homicide by vehicle while driving under influence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-6) |
2014-06-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-09 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-09 | House | Vote on second consideration reconsidered (195-0) |
2014-06-04 | House | Second consideration |
2014-06-03 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-08 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-10-01 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |