PA HB1652 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-02 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-02 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating Whitaker Avenue from its intersection with Roosevelt Boulevard in Philadelphia City, Philadelphia County, to the point where it meets East Erie Avenue in Philadelphia City, Philadelphia County, as the 65th Infantry "Borinqueneers" Avenue.
Title
Designating Whitaker Avenue from its intersection with Roosevelt Boulevard in Philadelphia City, Philadelphia County, to the point where it meets East Erie Avenue in Philadelphia City, Philadelphia County, as the 65th Infantry "Borinqueneers" Avenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2014-04-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-04-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2014-04-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-04-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-04-09 | House | Second consideration |
2014-04-08 | House | Removed from table |
2014-01-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-01-14 | House | Removed from table |
2013-11-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-11-13 | House | First consideration |
2013-11-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-08-26 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |