PA HB162 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-12)
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-16 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-16 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in proceedings prior to petition to adopt, further providing for hearing, for alternative procedure for relinquishment and for grounds for involuntary termination; and in adoption, further providing for definitions, for filing information with registry and for original birth record.
Title
In proceedings prior to petition to adopt, further providing for hearing, for alternative procedure for relinquishment and for grounds for involuntary termination; and in adoption, further providing for definitions, for filing information with registry and for original birth record.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-16 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-23 - House - HB 162 PN 2579, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-10-22 - House - HB 162 PN 2504, 2013 A4009, LAWRENCE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-22 - House - HB 162 PN 2504, 2013 A3999, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-23 - House - HB 162 PN 2579, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-10-22 - House - HB 162 PN 2504, 2013 A4009, LAWRENCE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-22 - House - HB 162 PN 2504, 2013 A3999, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-16 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-09-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2013-10-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-10-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2013-10-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-10-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-10-22 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-10-16 | House | Removed from table |
2013-10-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-10-16 | House | First consideration |
2013-10-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |