PA HB1559 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-17)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-17)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, providing for youth suicide awareness and prevention and for child exploitation awareness education.
Title
In terms and courses of study, providing for youth suicide awareness and prevention and for child exploitation awareness education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 1559 PN 2110, FP (Y: 194 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 1559 PN 2110, FP (Y: 194 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | House | Act No. 71 |
2014-06-26 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-06-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-16 | House | Signed in House |
2014-06-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments, as amended by the Senate (197-0) |
2014-06-16 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-06-11 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-06-11 | House | In the House |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (49-0) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-04-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-04-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (191-0) |
2014-04-09 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-02-04 | House | In the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-0) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-12-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2013-09-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-09-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-3) |
2013-09-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-07-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-07-01 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-27 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |