PA HB1521 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-08 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-08 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board, further providing for general powers of board and for enforcement; and, in licenses and regulations relating to liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for license fees, for revocation and suspension of licenses and fines and for penalties.
Title
In Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board, further providing for general powers of board and for enforcement; and, in licenses and regulations relating to liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for license fees, for revocation and suspension of licenses and fines and for penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-08 | House | Removed from table |
2014-10-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-07-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-03 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-03 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-03 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-06-12 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |