PA HB1243 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-07 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-07 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for Pennsylvania State Police and for limitation on the regulation of firearms and ammunition.
Title
In firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for Pennsylvania State Police and for limitation on the regulation of firearms and ammunition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-07 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2014-10-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (143-54) |
2014-09-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-23 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-29 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-03 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-03-19 | House | Removed from table |
2014-03-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-03-18 | House | First consideration |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |