PA HB118 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 52-23)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Act No. 87
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 52-23)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Act No. 87
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 12, 1986 (P.L.1559, No.169), known as the Whistleblower Law, further providing for the definitions of "appropriate authority," "employee," "employer" and "good faith report," for protection of employees, for enforcement and for penalties.
Title
Further providing for the definitions of "appropriate authority," "employee," "employer" and "good faith report," for protection of employees, for enforcement and for penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - HB 118 PN 242, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - HB 118 PN 242, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | House | Act No. 87 |
2014-07-02 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-07-01 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-29 | House | Signed in House |
2014-06-29 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (198-0) |
2014-06-29 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-06-28 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-06-27 | House | In the House |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2013-02-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-02-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2013-02-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-02-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-02-04 | House | Second consideration |
2013-01-23 | House | Removed from table |
2013-01-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-01-22 | House | First consideration |
2013-01-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-01-16 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |