PA HB1149 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, providing for drug overdose response use immunity.
Title
Providing for drug overdose response use immunity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2014-03-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-03-11 | House | First consideration |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |