PA HB1022 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of State Route 23 in West Hempfield Township, Lancaster County, as the SFC Brent Adams Memorial Road.
Title
Designating a portion of State Route 23 in West Hempfield Township, Lancaster County, as the SFC Brent Adams Memorial Road.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - HB 1022 PN 1215, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2013-04-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-04-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2013-04-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-04-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-04-09 | House | Second consideration |
2013-03-20 | House | Removed from table |
2013-03-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-03-20 | House | First consideration |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |