PA HB1013 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 196
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 196
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in pupils and attendance, further providing for home education program.
Title
In pupils and attendance, further providing for home education program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-14 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-23 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-23 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Act No. 196 |
2014-10-31 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-20 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (129-68) |
2014-10-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-15 | House | In the House |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (37-11) |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2014-06-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-06-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (133-65) |
2014-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-27 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-04 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-04 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-03-15 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |