OR SJR10 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to local option ad valorem property taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to local option ad valorem property taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-08SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2013-02-27SenatePublic Hearing held.
2013-01-16SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue, then Rules.
2013-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback