OR SB444 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates offense of smoking in motor vehicle.
Title
Relating to smoking in a motor vehicle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2014. |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Chapter 361, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Thompson, Greenlick. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 15--Barker, Bentz, Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Krieger, Olson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 2--McLane, Speaker Kotek. |
2013-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-29 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-28 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-15 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2013-03-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 19; nays, 10--Baertschiger, Close, Ferrioli, George, Johnson, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Beyer. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |