OR HB3077 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-8)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-8)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts Interstate Compact for Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote.
Title
Relating to Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-04-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Garrett. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 21--Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Parrish, Richardson, Thatcher, Unger, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Witt; Excused, 1--Gomberg. |
2013-04-17 | House | Second reading. |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-04-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |