OR HB2706 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-22 - Chapter 209, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Permits owner of self-service storage facility to charge late fee for failure to pay or late payment of rent due.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to self-service storage facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-22HouseChapter 209, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
2013-05-22HouseGovernor signed.
2013-05-15SenatePresident signed.
2013-05-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-05-13SenateThird reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Hass; excused, 2--Johnson, Prozanski.
2013-05-09SenateSecond reading.
2013-05-09SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2013-05-06SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2013-04-18SenateReferred to Business and Transportation.
2013-04-11SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2013-04-10HouseThird reading. Carried by Witt. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--McKeown, Vega Pederson.
2013-04-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2013 Calendar.
2013-04-08HouseSecond reading.
2013-04-04HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2013-04-03HouseWork Session held.
2013-04-01HouseWork Session held.
2013-03-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2013-02-11HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2013-02-04HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback