OK SJR13 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Tourism and International Relations
Pending: House Tourism and International Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Tourism and International Relations
Pending: House Tourism and International Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Bicycle routes; designating Route 66 as Oklahoma's Official Bicycle Route.
Title
Bicycle routes; designating Route 66 as Oklahoma's Official Bicycle Route.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Tourism and International Relations |
2013-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by Russ (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Anderson |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |