OK SCR32 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-13)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-13)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Memorializing Congress to direct USGS to conduct a master multi-state study of the Red River Watershed Basin.
Title
Memorializing Congress to direct USGS to conduct a master multi-state study of the Red River Watershed Basin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
2014-03-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-03-25 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate |
2014-03-25 | House | Considered |
2014-03-18 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2014-03-17 | Senate | coauthored by all other Senators except Holt, Treat |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Considered |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by McDaniel (Curtis) (principal House author) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ellis |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |