OK SB926 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Recycling; Oklahoma Recycling Initiative; priority for certain energy intensive industries to achieve energy efficiency. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recycling; Oklahoma Recycling Initiative; priority for certain energy intensive industries to achieve energy efficiency. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-06 - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House: Energy and Aerospace Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13SenateApproved by Governor 05/13/2013
2013-05-07SenateSent to Governor
2013-05-07HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled, to House
2013-05-06Senatecoauthored by Johnson (Constance)
2013-05-06SenateReferred for enrollment
2013-05-06SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2013-05-06SenateHAs adopted
2013-04-18SenateHAs read
2013-04-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2013-04-17HouseReferred for engrossment
2013-04-17HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2
2013-04-17HouseGeneral Order
2013-04-03HouseTitle restored
2013-04-03HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Aerospace Committee
2013-03-14HouseSecond Reading referred to Energy and Aerospace
2013-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2013-03-07SenateEngrossed to House
2013-03-06SenateReferred for engrossment
2013-03-06SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2013-03-06SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2013-02-21SenateTitle stricken
2013-02-21SenateEmergency added
2013-02-21Senatecoauthored by McNiel (principal House author)
2013-02-21SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
2013-02-13SenateReferred to Energy
2013-02-13SenateWithdrawn from Rules committee
2013-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2013-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Johnson (Rob)
2013-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10A26New CodeSee Bill Text
27A210New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback