OK SB906 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Elections; establishing Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by Popular Vote; providing procedures. Effective date.
Title
Elections; establishing Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by Popular Vote; providing procedures. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Rob Johnson [R] | Sen. John Sparks [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 18 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-02-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2014-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by Sparks |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Armes (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |