OK SB759 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Student transfers; creating the Deployed Parents School Act of 2013. Effective date.
Title
Student transfers; creating the Deployed Parents School Act of 2013. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Coody [R] | Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Sen. Dan Newberry [R] |
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 18 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 18 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/14/2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | coauthored by Newberry |
2013-05-07 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2013-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 |
2013-04-23 | House | Amended |
2013-04-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett |
2013-04-23 | House | General Order |
2013-04-03 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Allen, Ivester |
2013-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Coody (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |